Case Information: 51458 | |||
Short Caption: | VENETIAN CASINO RESORT VS. RYAN'S EXPRESS TRANSP. SERV. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52927 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A531864 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/22/2008 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/18/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Snell & Wilmer, LLP--check no. 7537. | ||
04/18/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09718 | |
04/22/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. | 08-10014 | |
04/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/29/08. | 08-10639 | |
05/06/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11225 | |
05/06/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 08-11226 | |
05/14/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 08-12150 | |
06/02/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-13841 | |
06/09/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-14493 | |
06/19/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/27/07, 1/8/08, 1/28/08, 1/29/08. To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 08-15737 | |
06/19/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/18/07. To Court Reporter: Blanca Cano. | 08-15738 | |
06/19/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings to Mary Beth Cook. Due date: 10 days. | 08-15739 | |
06/19/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings to Blanca Cano. Due date: 10 days. | 08-15743 | |
06/25/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Blanca I. Cano stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: October 18, 2007. | 08-16246 | |
06/26/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings served on Blanca Cano. | 08-16412 | |
06/26/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Request for Transcripts of Proceedings served on Mary Beth Cook. | 08-16415 | |
07/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant: 30 days to show cause. Briefing suspended. | 08-16701 | |
07/15/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Mary Beth Cook stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/27/07, 1/28/08, 1/29/08. | 08-18158 | |
08/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-20013 | |
09/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed as premature." NNP08-WM/MC/NS. | 08-22832 | |
09/30/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23497 | |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/08/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 3, 2008. | 08-23497 |