judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAMB (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51457
Short Caption:LAMB (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C209341Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/16/2010 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/16/2010How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/17/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/17/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-09601
04/28/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-10534
04/28/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/08/05, 5/31/05, 1/18/06, 5/09/06, 6/08/06, 8/03/06, 1/16/07, 1/18/07, 8/29/07, 11/07/07, 12/17/07, 1/02/08, 1/04/08, 1/07/08, 1/08/08, 1/09/08, 1/10/08, 1/11/08, 1/14/08, 1/15/08, 1/16/08, 1/17/08, 1/18/08, 1/28/08, 1/29/08, 2/13/08, and 3/13/08. To Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn and Joe D'Amato. 08-10536
06/20/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Maureen Schorn to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. 3/08/05, 5/31/05, 8/03/06, 3/13/08, 1/07/08, 1/08/08, 1/09/08, 1/10/08, and 1/11/08. Due date: 10 days. 08-15836
06/20/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Joe D'Amato to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. 1/18/06, 5/09/06, 6/08/06, 1/16/07, 1/18/07, 8/29/07, 11/07/07, 12/17/07, 1/02/08, 1/04/08, and 2/13/08. Due date: 10 days. 08-15837
07/03/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. J. A. D'Amato stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/14/08; 1/15/08; 1/16/08; 1/18/08; 1/16/07; 1/18/06; 1/18/07; 8/29/07; 11/7/07; and 12/17/07. 08-17042
07/14/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/8/05; 5/31/05; 8/3/06; 1/9/08; 1/10/08; and 1/11/08. 08-18023
07/15/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/7/08. 08-18160
07/16/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/13/08. 08-18323
07/29/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/8/08. 08-19527
08/08/2008MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 15, 2008. 08-20603
08/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $250.00 due: 15 days or Court Reporter Joe D'Amato's certificate of delivery or motion due: 10 days. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] 08-20804
08/26/2008Other Returned Mail. Order filed 8/12/08 to Certified Court Reporters Board. Updated address per info on envelope. Remailed 8/26/08. 08-21938
09/22/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-24430
10/09/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Mr. D'Amato has neither filed the certificate of delivery nor a motion for an extension of time, or provided this court with proof of payment of the sanctions. The conditional sanctions imposed in our August 12, 2008, order remain in effect. Mr. D'Amato 10 days file a certificate acknowledging delivery of the above-listed transcripts and provide this court with proof of payment of the $250.00 sanction. We refer Mr. D'Amato to the Nevada Certified Court Reporters Board (Board) for investigation pursuant to NRAP 13(b). The Board: 60 days to inform this court of the status or results of the investigation and any disciplinary proceedings. Appellant's motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief is granted to the following extent. Appellant: 55 days from to file the opening brief and appendix. 08-26087
10/20/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Joe D'Amato stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates specified. 08-26985
11/17/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. In response to our October 9, 2008, order, court reporter Joe D'Amato filed numerous cover pages of transcripts previously filed in the district court. Such a filing does not constitute a certificate of delivery as contemplated by NRAP 9(b). Mr. D'Amato is admonished for his failure to comply with this court's procedural rules. Accordingly, Mr. D'Amato's obligation to file a certificate acknowledging delivery of the May 9, 2006, January 2, 4, 17, 28, 29, 2008, and February 13, 2008, transcripts is waived, in this instance only. Mr. D'Amato shall have seven days from the date of this order to file and serve a certificate acknowledging delivery of the June 8, 2006 transcript, or show cause why additional sanctions should not be imposed. To date, Mr. D'Amato has failed to provide proof of payment of the $250.00 sanctions imposed in our August 12, 2008, order. Mr. D'Amato shall have seven days from the date of this order to provide proof of payment of these sanctions, or show cause why additional sanctions should not be imposed. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 40 days. 08-29196
12/02/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Proof of Payment for Sanctions. 08-30617
12/02/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Joe D'Amato stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/08/06. 08-30618
12/30/2008Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Nevada Certified Court Reporters Board regarding their investigation conducted against court reporter Joseph A. D'Amato. (In response to order filed 10/09/08). 08-32969
01/02/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60 days). 09-00032
01/12/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 27, 2009. 09-00746
03/04/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-05513
03/10/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 28, 2009. 09-06062
05/29/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10 days. 09-13341
06/04/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 8, 2009. 09-14079
06/08/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Two Day Extension of Time. 09-14340
06/15/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant Lamb's Motion for Leave to File Forty-Nine (49) Page Opening Brief. 09-14790
06/18/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received on June 15, 2009. Answering Brief due: 30 days. 09-15109
06/18/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-14792
06/18/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 12. 09-14794
07/20/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60 days). 09-17678
07/22/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: September 21, 2009. 09-17936
09/22/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to Fole 35 Page Answering Brief. 09-22948
09/22/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief 35 pages. 09-22949
09/22/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-22950
10/20/2009MotionFiled Stipulation. (30) days. 09-25517
10/20/2009Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due date: November 23, 2009. 09-25518
11/24/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-28640
04/28/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 16, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. SNP10-JH/MD/KP) 10-10888
06/01/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 10-14099
06/16/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/03/2011Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Douglas, Pickering, Hardesty. Author: Pickering, J. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 3. SNP10-Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty. 11-06524
03/28/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-09275
03/28/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
04/06/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 1, 2011. 11-09275
04/08/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to publishers re: corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 51457, 52167, 54332, 54375, 54442. Document no. 11-10447 in 51457. 11-10447