Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/16/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Les W. Bradshaw check no. 1176. | | |
03/16/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 09-06602 |
03/23/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott | | 09-07213 |
03/27/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days (12/29/08 - Order on Defendant Rogney's Motion for Summary Judgment; 1/6/09 - Notice of Entry of Order) | | 09-07675 |
03/31/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 09-08065 |
03/31/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. | | 09-08066 |
04/01/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | | 09-08224 |
04/02/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 12/29/08. Order on Defendant Graham Rogney's Motion for Summary Judgment. | | 09-08358 |
04/02/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: 1/6/09. Attached is the Order Granting Defendant McFarland Door Manufacturing Co., Inc.'s and Chad Morgan's First Motion in Limine to Limit Plantiff's Claimed Damages to Only Those That are Recoverable Under Nevada Law. | | 09-08360 |
04/24/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/24/09 | | 09-10235 |
06/25/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 09-15798 |
06/30/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | | 09-16099 |
07/15/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/5/09 through 1/14/09. To Court Reporter: Tonja Lemich. | | 09-17413 |
08/04/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. Proceedings: All reported proceedings. To Court Reporter: Tonja Lemich. | | 09-18982 |
08/19/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Anita Fillmore stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/5/09 and 1/12/09. | | 09-20191 |
08/27/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Tonja Gill Lemich stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/06/09, 01/09/09, and 01/13/09. | | 09-20920 |
08/28/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kathy Terhune stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/07/09 and 1/08/09. | | 09-21071 |
09/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 09-22414 |
09/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting in Part Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. | | 09-22883 |
10/19/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Clarification of Appellant's Second Motin for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (30) days. | | 09-25347 |
10/19/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 09-25443 |
11/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time to file the opening brief. Due 11/16/09. | | 09-27247 |
11/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion to Supplement the Appellate Record. (DETACHED AND FILED EXHIBITS PER ORDER 12/10/09). | | 09-27853 |
11/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Opening Brief. Granted: 39 pages. | | 09-27854 |
11/16/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 09-27855 |
11/16/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1-6. | | 09-27857 |
11/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 15, 2010. | | 09-28584 |
11/25/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Respondents Rogney & Sons Construction and Peter Rogney. | | 09-28745 |
11/25/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file answering brief (Rogney & Sons Construction and Peter Rogney) is approved. Due date: January 15, 2010. | | 09-28757 |
12/10/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Supplement the Appellate Record. The clerk of this court shall detach and file the exhibits attached to appellant's November 16, 2009, motion. | | 09-29974 |
12/10/2009 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Detached from Motion filed November 16, 2009 per order 12/10/09. | | 09-29975 |
12/14/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents McFarland Door and Chad Morgan. | | 09-30179 |
12/14/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. (PAGES 001-006 STRICKEN PER ORDER 04/09/10). Respondents McFarland Door and Chad Morgan. | | 09-30180 |
12/30/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Rogney & Sons; Peter Rogney. | | 09-31540 |
01/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Respondents' (Rogney & Sons Construction and Peter Rogney) Answering Brief due: February 1, 2010. | | 10-01232 |
01/15/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Valley Door Works, Charles Grant and Kathy Grant. | | 10-01331 |
02/01/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Answering Brief of Respondents Rogney and Sons, Peter Rogney and Graham Rogney. | | 10-02666 |
03/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Appellant's Motions to Strike Respondents McFarland Door's and Morgan's Exhibit RA 001-006, and Portions of the Answer of Valley Door Works. | | 10-05919 |
03/05/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply to Answering Brief of McFarland and Morgan. | | 10-05920 |
03/05/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply to Answering Brief of Rogney Respondents. | | 10-05922 |
03/05/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply to Answering Brief of Valley Door Works, Charles Grant, and Kathy Grant. | | 10-05923 |
03/05/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. CD accompanied with appendix. | | 10-05924 |
03/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. McFarland Door's and Chad Morgan's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike. | | 10-06027 |
03/18/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition of Respondents Valley Door Works, Charles Grant and Kathy Grant to Appellant's Motion to Strike. | | 10-07247 |
03/18/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave of Court to File Appendix of Respondents Valley Door Works, Charles Grant and Kathy Grant. | | 10-07250 |
03/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to "Motion for Leave of Court to File Appendix of Respondents Valley Door Works, Charles Grant and Kathy Grant". | | 10-07824 |
04/09/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting in Part Appellant's Motion to Strike and Granting Respondents' Motion to File Appendix. The clerk of this court is directed to strike page numbers 001-006 of the appendix filed in this court by McFarland Door and Morgan on December 14, 2009, which is a document entitled "Defendants Valley Door Works, Charles Grant, and Kathy Grant's Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Amend Complaint." We deny Garmong's motion to strike portions of VDW's answer. Instead, we grant VDW's motion to file an appendix containing portions of trial transcripts. The clerk of this court shall file VDW's appendix, which was provisionally received on March 18, 2010. Garmong shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve an amended reply and reply appendix to VDW's answer. | | 10-09352 |
04/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief with CD-ROM included. Respondents Valley Door Works, Charles Grant and Kathy Grant's Appendix. | | 10-07251 |
05/05/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant's Amended Reply Brief. (In response to order filed 4/09/10). | | 10-11542 |
09/27/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for November 9, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City before the Northern Nevada Panel. | | 10-24699 |
09/30/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter in response to notice filed 9/27/10. | | 10-25334 |
10/26/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 10-28002 |
11/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to reschedule oral argument. The oral argument presently scheduled is hereby vacated. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this appeal for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 10-28569 |
12/15/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for January 13, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. (NNP11-MD/MC/KP) | | 10-32777 |
12/27/2010 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. | | 10-33666 |
12/30/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 10-34159 |
01/13/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. (NNP11-MC/MG/KP) | | |
04/27/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | | 11-12434 |
05/16/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 11-14381 |
05/16/2011 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Gregory O. Garmong. Check No. 2022. | | |
07/01/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 11-19578 |
07/18/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 11-21486 |
09/20/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | | 11-28694 |
10/17/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 11-31905 |
10/17/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
10/26/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2011. | | 11-31905 |
01/11/2013 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 13-01288 |