Case Information: 53424 | |||
Short Caption: | CASILLAS-GUTIERREZ (MIGUEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 60411 , 71626 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080985 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/30/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/13/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Casillas-Gutierrez, Defendant | 09-06566 | |
03/13/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/17/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/8/08 through 12/11/09. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporters. | 09-06680 | |
03/17/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-06681 | |
03/20/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Juror Names - Filed under Seal. (SEALED) | 09-07153 | |
04/01/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Leslie Kay stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/11/08. | 09-08233 | |
04/01/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Amy Jo Trevino stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/2/08. | 09-08238 | |
04/15/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Susan Culp stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/10/08, 12/11/08. | 09-09507 | |
04/16/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Gail Willsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/8/08. | 09-09552 | |
04/23/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Debora Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/9/09. | 09-10102 | |
07/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 09-16859 | |
07/09/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file the Opening Brief is approved. Due date: August 12, 2009. | 09-16860 | |
08/11/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 09-19544 | |
08/11/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due September 11, 2009. | 09-19582 | |
09/04/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-21591 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume One | 09-21607 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume Two | 09-21609 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume Three, Part 1 | 09-21610 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume Three, Part 2 | 09-21611 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume Three, Part 3 | 09-21613 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume Four, Part 1 | 09-21614 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume Four, Part 2 | 09-21615 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume Four, Part 3 | 09-21616 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume 5 | 09-21617 | |
09/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix Volume Six | 09-21618 | |
09/04/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Certificate of Service (Volumes 1 through 6 of Joint Appendix) | 09-21626 | |
10/05/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-24297 | |
11/02/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. | 09-26686 | |
12/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-31580 | |
12/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. | 10-06329 | |
04/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-07096 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. | 10-07096 |