Case Information: 51440 | |||
Short Caption: | KLEVEN VS. NORTHWESTERN INVEST. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0701271 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/21/2008 / Andrews, Jonathan | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Second Judicial District Court check no. 15334. | ||
04/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09372 | |
04/21/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jonathan L. Andrews. | 08-09802 | |
05/01/2008 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. No original signature of counsel and not typewritten. | 08-10880 | |
05/14/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/9/08. | 08-12119 | |
06/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Docketing Statement due: 10 days. Counsel cautioned. | 08-14243 | |
06/06/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-14343 | |
06/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Each party to assume its own costs and attorney fees. | 08-14345 | |
06/26/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK-TH [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16316 | |
06/26/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |