Case Information: 51439 | |||
Short Caption: | SCHMIDT VS. WASHOE CO. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0702760 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/23/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from American Legal & Secretarial check no. 10073. | ||
04/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09360 | |
04/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days. | 08-09651 | |
05/05/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-11038 | |
06/04/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . in the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to waive counsel's responsibility to file the motion to extend time to file the docketing statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on May 8, 2008. | 08-14134 | |
06/04/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11465 | |
07/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-18283 | |
07/16/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 2. | 08-18284 | |
07/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-18227 | |
08/15/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 2, 2008. | 08-21123 | |
09/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Request. | 08-22473 | |
09/11/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on September 5, 2008. | 08-23535 | |
09/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-22859 | |
12/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 08-32485 | |
12/23/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/03/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Representing Appellant Glade L. Hall, Esq. | 09-05390 | |
09/08/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment and order of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-21723 | |
10/06/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-22845 | |
10/06/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/14/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 7, 2009. | 09-22845 |