Case Information: 53430 | |||
Short Caption: | JARVIS (DANNY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53037 , 53059 , 53383 , 54640 , 54838 , 57375 , 57376 , 57378 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR0005584 Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR0005504 Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR0006005 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/17/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/17/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-06735 | |
03/17/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 09-06736 | |
03/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel, Jason L. Earnest shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. | 09-07226 | |
05/12/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-11725 | |
06/09/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-13797 | |
06/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/17/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 15, 2009. | 09-13797 |