Case Information: 53429 | |||
Short Caption: | ALLEN (GENE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41274 , 42969 , 43599 , 44180 , 44597 , 44991 , 45220 , 45368 , 45447 , 45643 , 46035 , 46666 , 47311 , 47501 , 48289 , 49167 , 49612 , 50188 , 50477 , 50809 , 51219 , 51353 , 51675 , 51940 , 52984 , 53246 , 53428 , 53732 , 53911 , 54132 , 54302 , 55013 , 55574 , 55677 , 55828 , 56586 , 57925 , 57990 , 58038 , 58426 , 58427 , 58807 , 59173 , 60890 , 61311 , 72586 , 72586-COA , 72853 , 72864 , 72929 , 72964 , 73526 , 77046 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177427 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/16/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-06608 | |
03/16/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/14/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[We have received all proper person documents submitted in this matter, and we conclude that no relief is warranted for the reason set forth above.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-09403 | |
04/24/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 4/14/09 addressed to Gene Anthony Allen. Address updated per NDOC and filed Order remailed to new address. | 09-10292 | |
05/12/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-10545 | |
05/12/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2009. | 09-10545 |