Case Information: 51441 | |||
Short Caption: | SWOPE VS. NV. ST. CONTRACTORS BD. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0701081 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/23/2008 / Hamilton, Paul | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg check no. 16382. | ||
04/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09378 | |
04/23/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Paul F. Hamilton. | 08-10040 | |
04/30/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-10793 | |
06/27/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 8/26/08. | 08-16478 | |
09/02/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests an extension of time of an additional 30 days to file the final settlement status report. Appeal may be rendered moot by ruling in district court action set for trial mid-October. | 08-22463 | |
11/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Settlement Judge's extension request granted. Settlement Judge: 30 days to file Final Settlement Conference Status Report | 08-30155 | |
12/04/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Settlement documents are being prepared & exchanged by counsel and a stipulation to dismiss will follow. | 08-30905 | |
12/09/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 08-31409 | |
12/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 08-32229 | |
12/24/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- PANEL-TH | 08-32635 | |
12/24/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |