Case Information: 53408 | |||
Short Caption: | SANTOS (DANIEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53528 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228836 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/12/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-06400 | |
03/12/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/26/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-07596 | |
04/21/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-08285 | |
04/21/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/30/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 24, 2009. | 09-08285 |