Case Information: 53407 | |||
Short Caption: | NELLUMS (JAMES) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33639 , 42506 , 45877 , 63827 , 74399 , 74399-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C144167 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/24/2010 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/12/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-06395 | |
03/12/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 09-07125 | |
04/08/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 27, 2009. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. | 09-08848 | |
04/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. District court order appointing counsel due: 35 days. | 09-10029 | |
05/20/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Minute Order appointing counsel (Att. Dan Winder) entered on 5/13/09. | 09-12525 | |
05/20/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 09-12526 | |
05/29/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-13376 | |
05/29/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/4/09. To Court Reporter: Jessica Ramirez. | 09-13395 | |
06/15/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/04/09. | 09-14847 | |
09/24/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 09-23281 | |
11/03/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $500 due: 15 days, or Opening Brief and Appendix or Motion due: 10 days. | 09-26826 | |
11/04/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Ex-Parte Motion For Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief & Appendix. | 09-27007 | |
11/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 4, 2010. fn1[The conditional sanction imposed against attorney Dan Winder on November 3, 2009, based on his failure to file the opening brief and appendix is vacated because he filed a properly supported motion for extension of time within 10 days of that order.] | 09-27245 | |
02/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Ex-Parte Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief & Appendix. (90) days. | 10-03354 | |
02/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 4, 2010. | 10-03952 | |
05/18/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Ex-Parte Motion For Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief & Appendix. (60) days. | 10-12824 | |
05/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. | 10-13285 | |
06/18/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Ex-Parte Motion For Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief & Appendix | 10-15999 | |
06/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. and Directing Counsel to Show Cause. Appellant: 30 days to file the opening brief and appendix. 15 days to show case why he should not be sanctioned. | 10-16684 | |
07/08/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Courts Order to Show Cause | 10-17628 | |
07/28/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-19557 | |
07/28/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-19558 | |
08/24/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief-Respondent's Answering Brief. | 10-21652 | |
08/24/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief-Respondent's Appendix Vol. I. | 10-21653 | |
08/24/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering-Brief Respondent's Appendix Vol. II. | 10-21655 | |
09/24/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-24641 | |
09/24/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Based on counsel's response, we decline to impose sanctions at this time. We remind counsel of his obligation to comply with this court's order and caution him that in the future, motions for extensions of time must comply with this court's orders and appellate rules. | 10-24646 | |
02/09/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-04171 | |
03/07/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-06937 | |
03/07/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/18/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 15, 2011. | 11-06937 |