judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FEDERAL EXPRESS VS. MAZUREK

Case Information: 53402
Short Caption:FEDERAL EXPRESS VS. MAZUREKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A553616Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/20/2009 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/11/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Santoro, Driggs, Walch, Kearney, Holley & Thompson check no. 5507.
03/11/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-06261
03/20/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Buchanan 09-07059
03/30/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-07870
03/31/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/8/09 09-08131
05/12/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 6/18/09 09-11700
06/25/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 09-15795
06/25/2009Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 09-15796
06/25/2009MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 09-15797
06/30/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH 09-16109
06/30/2009Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.