judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GALLEGOS (FERNANDO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53423
Short Caption:GALLEGOS (FERNANDO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 64502 , 64502-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080385Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/15/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/13/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-06565
03/13/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/27/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 09-07800
03/30/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Amended Case Appeal Statement 09-07992
04/06/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Temporary Remand. for Designation of Counsel. Due: 35 days. 09-08547
05/06/2009Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on Recommendation and Order Appointing Counsel. (Glynn Cartledge appointed as counsel for appellant). 09-11305
05/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. (Docketing statement form mailed to counsel). 09-11311
05/21/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-12665
06/12/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/02/08, 06/13/08, 05/23/08 (2), 06/27/08, 11/05/08, 11/17/08, 11/18/08, 11/19/08, 11/20/08, 11/21/08, 12/08/08, and 03/11/08. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 09-14702
07/09/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter Isolde Zihn. 09-16969
07/14/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare Transcripts and Extending Briefing Schedule. Court reporter Isolde Zihn's certificate of delivery due: August 31, 2009. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 19, 2009. 09-17294
08/20/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/17/08 - 11/21/08, 5/02/08, 6/13/08, 6/23/08, and 6/27/08. 09-20285
10/16/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (60) days. 09-25229
10/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due 12/18/09. 09-25293
12/18/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-30730
12/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 18, 2010. 09-31525
01/20/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1 10-01552
01/20/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2 10-01554
01/20/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3 10-01555
01/20/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4 10-01556
01/20/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5 10-01557
01/20/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6 10-01558
01/20/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 7 10-01561
01/20/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (3) days. 10-01562
01/22/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: January 25, 2010. 10-01880
01/22/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-01915
02/22/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-04783
02/22/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 10-04784
03/16/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-06864
03/29/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Notice of Errata to Appellant's Opening and Reply Briefs 10-08073
06/15/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 10-15537
06/15/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/28/2010Order/DispositionalOrder of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 10-24872
10/25/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-27833
10/25/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
11/03/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 26, 2010. 10-27833