Case Information: 53418 | |||
Short Caption: | SULLIVAN VS. DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A540373 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/20/2009 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/13/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/13/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from James Andre Boles check no. 9015. | ||
03/13/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-06526 | |
03/20/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | 09-07064 | |
03/23/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-07291 | |
03/23/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement) | 09-07292 | |
05/28/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 8/17/09 | 09-13296 | |
08/19/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-20162 | |
08/25/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 09-20598 | |
12/23/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | 09-31116 | |
12/23/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 09-31117 | |
01/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-00967 | |
01/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due: 10 days. | 10-01416 | |
02/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for an Order Permitting Appellant to file a late Opening Brief. | 10-02875 | |
02/02/2010 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 02/08/10). Via E-Flex. | ||
02/03/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-02907 | |
02/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on February 2, 2010. | 10-03458 | |
02/08/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-03463 | |
02/09/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. to submit CD-ROM of appendix. Due date: 10 days. | 10-03586 | |
02/10/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Disclosure of CD-ROM of Appendices to Opening Brief. | 10-03730 | |
02/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief and Motion to Dismiss. | 10-03750 | |
03/10/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief | 10-06244 | |
03/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to Strike and Motion to Dismiss. | 10-06663 | |
04/22/2010 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No Reply Brief filed. | ||
05/13/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 10-12485 | |
05/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/20/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's decision." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-18572 | |
08/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19263 | |
08/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/20/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2010. | 10-19263 |