Case Information: 53414 | |||
Short Caption: | GONSKI VS. DIST. CT. (PN II, INC.) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53370 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0803125 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 03/09/2010 at 10:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 03/09/2010 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/13/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/13/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-06473 | |
03/13/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 09-06474 | |
03/13/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-06475 | |
03/17/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Nancy Avanzino-Gilbert, Esq. Check no. 1935. | ||
04/15/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. to Incorporate and Consolidate the District Court's April 10, 2009 Order Denying Motion for Reconsideration into Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 09-09497 | |
07/01/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Affidavit and Denying Motion to Incoprorate. Affidavit due 5 days. | 09-16270 | |
07/06/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Petitioner's Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Petitioner L. Gonski). (In response to Order 7/1/09) | 09-16462 | |
07/06/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Petitioner's Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Petitioner D. Gonski). (In response to Order 7/1/09) | 09-16463 | |
07/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. | 09-17514 | |
08/14/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Parties in Interest's Answering Brief | 09-19873 | |
08/14/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Real Parties in Interest. | 09-19874 | |
09/04/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief to Answering Brief. | 09-21596 | |
09/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to File Reply. The clerk of this court shall file the reply and appendix thereto provisionally received in this court on September 4, 2009. | 09-22817 | |
09/21/2009 | Petition/Writ | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition. | 09-21598 | |
09/21/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix to Petition of Writ of Mandamus. | 09-21599 | |
02/03/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on March 9, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. (SNP10-JH/MD/KP) | 10-02983 | |
02/09/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. regarding a conflict of the oral argument scheduled for March 8, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. | 10-03622 | |
02/11/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Supreme Court 2.11.10 (no objections to reschedule Oral Argument) | 10-03854 | |
02/23/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 10-04805 | |
03/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/30/2010 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." By the Court, Douglas, J. I concur: Hardesty, J. Pickering, J. concurring in part and dissenting in part. 126 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. SNP 10-JH/MD/KP | 10-34015 | |
12/30/2010 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of Opinion mailed to for service upon Judge Steven P. Elliott. | 10-34032 | |
01/05/2011 | Writ | Filed Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Steven P. Elliott on January 5, 2011. (10-34032). | ||
01/21/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 50282, 53191, 50033, 52543/52961, 52704, 53969, 55714, 52822, 51234, 52911, 49261, 51124, 51603, 52758, 53414, 53983/54471, 55429, 49207. (Letter entered in 50282 as document no. 11-03205.) | ||
01/24/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur | 11-02268 | |
01/24/2011 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |