Case Information: 53416 | |||
Short Caption: | MEJIA VS. WACHOVIA MORTGAGE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0802993 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/10/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/13/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Second Judicial District Court check no. 16254. | ||
03/13/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-06496 | |
03/19/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 09-07001 | |
04/15/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-09514 | |
05/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Tranmsission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant's Amended Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: 10 days. Respondent's Response (10 pages) to Appeal Statement due: 30 days. | 09-11442 | |
05/11/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. -Amended Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. (In response to order filed 5/08/09). | 09-11523 | |
05/13/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of Service of Amended Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement on Respondent Wachovia Mortgage. | 09-11829 | |
05/14/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Certified copy of Amended Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. (submitted by district court) | 09-11972 | |
05/14/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit indicating that respondent was served with Amended Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-12009 | |
05/20/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Amended Affidavit of Service. | 09-12563 | |
06/04/2009 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-14095 | |
06/04/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent Wachovia Mortage; FSB Appendix. (Appendix to Response to Proper Person Appeal Statement). | 09-14096 | |
06/09/2009 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Reply Brief and Motion to Strike Respondents' Trial Brief for Non-Compliance with Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure. FILED PER ORDER OF 6/26/09. | 09-14409 | |
06/10/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-14508 | |
06/10/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/22/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent Wachovia Mortgage, FSB's Opposition to Plantiff's "Motion to Strike Respondent's Trial Brief" and Request for Enlargement of Time to NRAP 26(b) | 09-15529 | |
06/26/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to Strike. Fn1 [We direct the clerk of this court to file the motion, provisionally received on June 9, 2009.] | 09-15891 | |
06/26/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Reply Brief and Motion to Strike Respondents' Trial Brief for Non-Compliance with Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure. | 09-14409 | |
07/28/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Notice of Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Respondent Wachovia Mortgage, FSB. | 09-18381 | |
09/28/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. We affirm the district court's decision to set aside the entry of default, but we reverse the order of dismissal and remand ths matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. | 10-24992 | |
10/25/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-27809 | |
10/25/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
11/03/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 26, 2010. | 10-27809 |