Case Information: 53415 | |||
Short Caption: | ALFORD (BRIAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 62763 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080261 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 05/06/2010 at 11:00 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Churchill County High School |
Submission Date: | 05/06/2010 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/13/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-06486 | |
03/13/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. | 09-07124 | |
03/20/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Rec for Docs 3/13/09 addressed to Brian Lamont Alford. Address updated per NDOC and Rec for Docs remailed to new address. | 09-07188 | |
04/03/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 3/20/09 addressed to Brian Lamont Alford. Remailed to new address. | 09-08415 | |
04/08/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed copy of order filed in district court on 4/6/09 appointing Karla K. Butko, Esq. as counsel for appellant. Recommendation and Order Appointing Counsel. | 09-08783 | |
04/08/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Appellant counsel Karla K. Butko, Esq. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. | 09-08786 | |
04/10/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Order. Copy of order filed in district court on 4/8/09. | 09-09032 | |
04/10/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Karla K. Butko. | 09-09079 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed copy of order filed in district court on 4/6/09 appointing Karla K. Butko, Esq. as counsel for appellant. Recommendation and Order Appointing Counsel. | 09-09274 | |
04/21/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-09946 | |
04/22/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Appellant's Ex Parte Motion for Transcripts at Taxpayers' Expense filed in district court on 04/21/09. | 09-10061 | |
05/26/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stephanie Koetting stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/12/09 through 1/16/09, 1/20/09, and 3/06/09. | 09-13043 | |
07/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Stipulation to Extend Filing Deadline for Opening Brief | 09-18103 | |
07/23/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: September 8, 2009. | 09-18104 | |
08/25/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 7. | 09-20702 | |
09/03/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). | 09-21470 | |
09/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due October 8, 2009. | 09-21631 | |
09/11/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Request by Appellant to File Opening Brief in excess of Thirty Pages Pursuant to NRAP 28. (55) pages | 09-22103 | |
09/14/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for excess pages. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on 9/11/09. | 09-22231 | |
09/14/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-22104 | |
10/14/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-25052 | |
11/16/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-27874 | |
03/12/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on May 6, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. (NNP10-MC/NS/MG) | 10-06646 | |
04/20/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 10-10258 | |
05/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. | ||
07/22/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-18939 | |
08/16/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19397 | |
08/16/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/02/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 24, 2010. | 10-19397 |