Case Information: 53404 | |||
Short Caption: | CARNEY VS. UNIVERSITY OF NEV. LAS VEGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A544313 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/17/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/12/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/12/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-06358 | |
03/12/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-06360 | |
03/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Evan Carney - check no. 5053. | ||
03/25/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 09-07566 | |
04/20/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-09775 | |
05/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to Properly Serve his Notice of Appeal and Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Amended Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: 15 days. Certificate of Service due: 15 days. | 09-11443 | |
05/15/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 5/8/09 addressed to Evan Carney. Per USPS "not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward". | 09-12225 | |
05/20/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Certificate of Service of Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement | 09-12597 | |
05/20/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Proof of Service to Notice of Appeal. | 09-12598 | |
06/26/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. A544313: 30 days. Respondents: 60 days to file a response. | 09-15841 | |
07/17/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. | 09-17629 | |
07/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/27/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. (with attachments) | 09-20934 | |
09/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Appellant's Reply Brief. | 09-21765 | |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-03314 | |
02/25/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing Pursuant to NRAP 40. | 10-05082 | |
04/09/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-09253 | |
04/21/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Petition for En Banc Reconsideration Pursuant to NRAP 40A. | 10-10355 | |
06/22/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 10-16295 | |
07/19/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-18313 | |
07/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/26/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 22, 2010. | 10-18313 |