Case Information: 51452 | |||
Short Caption: | GLEASON (PATRICK) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0601610C | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/16/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/16/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-09525 | |
04/28/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 02/13/08 and 03/18/08. Court Reporter: Constance Eisenberg. Filed in district court on: 04/14/08. | 08-10452 | |
04/29/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Constance Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/13/08. | 08-10623 | |
05/05/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Deborah Middleton Greco stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/18/08. | 08-11181 | |
05/28/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 3, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-13359 | |
06/06/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-14385 | |
06/06/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-14389 | |
06/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Response to Fast Track Statement. | 08-15413 | |
06/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: July 23, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16384 | |
07/23/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-19057 | |
07/23/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-19058 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-09158 | |
05/08/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-10522 | |
05/08/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2009. | 09-10522 |