Case Information: 51453 | |||
Short Caption: | GOODALL (JAMES) VS. SR. OFFICER BAUMAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 06OC012261B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/16/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/16/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-09532 | |
04/29/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 08-10683 | |
05/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-11371 | |
06/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-12058 | |
06/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 4, 2008. | 08-12058 |