judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FELTON VS. FELTON

Case Information: 51442
Short Caption:FELTON VS. FELTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0601848Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/18/2008 / Meador, ShawnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/13/2010 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/13/2010How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/15/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Pederson & Kalter, P.C. check no. 1397.
04/15/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-09383
04/18/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Shawn B. Meador. 08-09685
04/22/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Respondent. 08-09959
04/25/2008MotionFiled Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition. 08-10346
04/25/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. For Notice of Non-Opposition. 08-10349
04/29/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-10662
05/07/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement conference program. Mr. Felton does not have counsel and expresses no room for compromise. 08-11352
05/23/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Notice of Non-Opposition served on settlement judge. 08-13075
07/03/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. of Respondent's Counsel to Withdraw, removing from settlement conference program and reinstating briefing pursuant to NRAP 3E. Appellant: 10 days to request transcripts and 40 days to file fast track statement and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-17035
07/21/2008Transcript RequestReceived Certificate of No Transcript Request. FILED PER ORDER OF 9/2/08. 08-18807
08/14/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-21002
08/22/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Removing Appeal from Fast Track Program, Directing Full Briefing, and Denying as Moot Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant: 120 days to file the opening brief and appendix. Fn2 [In light of this order, appellant's motion for a 30-day extension of time to file her fast track statement and appendix is denied a moot.] 08-21652
09/02/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall file the certificate of no transcript request received on July 21, 2008. 08-22499
09/02/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 08-18807
12/19/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 19, 2009. 08-32231
01/16/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-01408
01/16/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-2. 09-01409
02/04/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Appellant's Opening Brief Appendix Vols 1-2. 09-03115
02/05/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Return Receipt Requested - from Attorney Wayne Pederson. 09-03244
02/18/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-04244
02/20/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Kenneth McKenna as counsel for respondent. 09-04434
03/10/2009Other Other. Received Reply to Respondent's Opening Brief. 09-06124
03/13/2009MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Opening Brief. 09-06518
04/01/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Leave to File a Reply Brief. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's reply brief provisionally received on March 10, 2009. 09-08184
04/01/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-06124
05/26/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 09-12971
05/26/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/17/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 13, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. (NNP09-MC/NS/MG) 09-28013
11/19/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of Mailing. (Notice of Electornic Filing Scheduling Argument) 09-28234
12/30/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 09-31553
01/13/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP10--MC/NS/MG
02/25/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG 10-05070
03/23/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-05831
03/23/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 26, 2010. 10-05831
07/01/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record. (Appellant counsel Wayne Pederson) 10-17168