Case Information: 51432 | |||
Short Caption: | ELLIOT (CLARENCE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33630 , 35329 , 49245 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C142132 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/15/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/15/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-09284 | |
05/15/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12292 | |
06/10/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13096 | |
06/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2008. | 08-13096 |