judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PARKER (KENDRICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51433
Short Caption:PARKER (KENDRICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C230002Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/26/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/15/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/15/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-09298
05/07/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 08-11360
06/26/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 08-16431
06/26/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/17/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Fn7 [This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD. 08-32021
01/13/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-00402
01/13/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/21/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 15, 2009. 09-00402