Case Information: 51355 | |||
Short Caption: | LEWELLIN (GARY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR080053 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Gary Lewellin, Appellant | 08-08133 | |
04/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/01/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-08134 | |
05/14/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. of Telephonic Extension for Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due Date: May 19, 2008. | 08-12108 | |
05/16/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix | 08-12323 | |
05/16/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-12324 | |
05/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion Requesting the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to Forward the Presentence Investigation Report contained in the Confidential Envelope in CR08-0053. | 08-12326 | |
05/22/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-12970 | |
06/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, transmit to the clerk of this court a sealed copy of the presentence investigation report that was filed in district court case number CR08-0053. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-13825 | |
06/13/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Documents. Presentence Investigation Report-SEALED. | 08-15064 | |
05/13/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP-RP/MD/KP. | 09-11811 | |
06/09/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-13804 | |
06/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/16/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 10, 2009. | 09-13804 |