judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VARNADO (LAVAR) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51375
Short Caption:VARNADO (LAVAR) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44378 , 46248 , 47962 , 55249 , 61957
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C191014Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:SaittaCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/13/2008How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/04/2008OtherDisqualification of Justice Saitta. Sat in district court proceedings.
04/04/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/04/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-08512
04/21/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 08-09788
06/13/2008Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. 08-15158
06/13/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/29/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn10 [We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-22216
09/23/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-22686
09/23/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/29/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 26, 2008. 08-22686