Case Information: 51357 | |||
Short Caption: | HALL (LEE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56175 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C211610 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/17/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/01/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-08150 | |
04/21/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 08-09787 | |
06/17/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-15453 | |
06/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/25/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-24872 | |
10/21/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-25161 | |
10/21/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/04/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 24, 2008. | 08-25161 |