Case Information: 49440 | |||
Short Caption: | SALVADORE (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C180911 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Saitta | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Maupin for Justice Saitta | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 06/18/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-10619 | |
05/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Nancy M. Saitta sat in district court proceedings. | 07-10620 | |
05/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Judge Barker: Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 07-11570 | |
06/11/2007 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Correct Illigal Sentence and Pro Per Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Granting Prop Per Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed in district court on June 5, 2007. | 07-12680 | |
06/18/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-13312 | |
06/18/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Due: 10 days. | 07-17388 | |
09/05/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/6/02. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. (submitted by Clark County Clerk) | 07-19494 | |
09/24/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-WM/MG/MC | 07-20953 | |
10/19/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22130 | |
10/19/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/30/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 22, 2007. | 07-22130 |