Case Information: 49454 | |||
Short Caption: | EL JWAIDI VS. DIST. CT. (SAGE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 50468 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A535188 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/15/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Patti, Sgro & Lewis - check no. 6636. | ||
05/15/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Pursuant to NRS Sec. 34.330, NRS Sec. 34.170 and NRAP 21. [IMMEDIATE ATTENTION REQUESTED]. | 07-10791 | |
05/15/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. | 07-10793 | |
05/16/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Proof of Service due: 5 days. Answer due: 10 days. | 07-10899 | |
05/22/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing (Petition served on Vicki Greco - filed via fax). | 07-11323 | |
05/22/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Petition personally served on Judge Villani (filed via fax). | 07-11324 | |
05/25/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Petition served on Judge and Counsel. | 07-11627 | |
05/29/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Petition served on Greco Law Group. | 07-11702 | |
06/04/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Response to Petition for a Writ of Prohibition and Mandamus Pursuant to NRS 34.330, NRS 34.170 and NRAP 21. | 07-12156 | |
06/04/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Answer. | 07-12157 | |
08/17/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. | 07-18199 | |
09/11/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 07-18562 | |
09/11/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |