Case Information: 49443 | |||
Short Caption: | RAHMAN (LUSAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52551 , 53297 , 58239 , 61505 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C228457 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-10639 | |
05/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 07-10640 | |
05/23/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Fast Track. Although the district court currently retains jurisdiction, upon the entry of the judgment of conviction, appellate jurisdiction will be vested in this court. The deadlines for the filing of documents are hereby suspended until further order of this court. The clerk of the district court shall have 5 days from the date of entry of the judgment of conviction to transmit a certified copy of the judgment to the clerk of this court. | 07-11330 | |
06/27/2007 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial) filed in district court on June 19, 2007. | 07-14079 | |
07/20/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Fast Track. This appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. Fast track statement and appendix due: 40 days. | 07-15837 | |
08/30/2007 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 9/6/07. | 07-19182 | |
09/10/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-19865 | |
09/10/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-19866 | |
09/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. C. Conrad Claus. | 07-19881 | |
09/14/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to withdraw as counsel. Lichtenstein shall continue as appellate counsel. State: 20 days to file fast track response. | 07-20303 | |
10/12/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-22568 | |
02/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant: 10 days to file a supplemental appendix including transcripts or show cause. | 08-02644 | |
02/13/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. (In response to order filed 02/01/08.) | 08-03664 | |
05/20/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn9[Because Rahman is represented by counsel in this matter, we decline to grant him permission to file documents in proper person in this court. This court shall take no action and shall not consider the proper person documents Rahman has submitted to this court in this matter.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12637 | |
06/17/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13165 | |
06/17/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2008. | 08-13165 |