Case Information: 49442 | |||
Short Caption: | RAMOS (CYNTHIA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204594 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-10633 | |
06/25/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Forty-Five (45) Day Extension of Time to file Fast Track Statement. | 07-13853 | |
06/29/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Transcript Request due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days from filing Transcripts. | 07-14240 | |
07/12/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 03/21/07 and 04/10/07. Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato. Filed in district court on: 06/15/07. | 07-15170 | |
08/13/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-17778 | |
08/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-17779 | |
08/28/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-19010 | |
08/28/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 07-19011 | |
10/16/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-22841 | |
11/13/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-24597 | |
11/13/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/03/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 15, 2007. | 07-24597 |