judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARRY VOID V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1149
Short Caption:HARRY VOID V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4610-04Filed Date:09/09/2010

Opening Event Date:09/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHarry Void YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John L. HillNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 9, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COPIES
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
11/02/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
11/03/2010TMC - appellant's motion for appointment of counsel - appellant's motion for extend briefing
11/10/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IS DENIED. It is *****MORE*****
11/10/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE HIS BRIEF IS GRANTED and his brief shall be filed W/N 30 DAYS from the date of this order. (RDBRNW) (rm)
11/23/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days.
12/27/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
01/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Served by: DCCA on 1/26/11).
02/15/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 20 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
03/04/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/06/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/08/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
06/30/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED since this court reviews the denial of motions tgo reduce sentence only for abuse of discretion...SEE HARDCOPY It is ***MORE****
06/30/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order ona ppeal be and IS AFFIRMED. (RZTHPR)
07/22/2011FiledMandate