judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREEN (ANTHONY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32050
Short Caption:GREEN (ANTHONY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C146837Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/16/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
03/27/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/31/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. 1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
09/16/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (copy)
09/16/1998Other Other. Case submitted on the Record on Appeal this day.
09/16/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. To Show Cause. The state shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why we should not remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings.
03/29/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause.
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. fn7[As we noted in our order to show cause, the general habeas corpus provisions do not indicate that appellant is required to serve the petition on any particular person.] " . . . we remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings on appellant's petition. " This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12097
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13763
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13763