judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RUSSEL R. ROBINSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0277)
Case Number:S-07-0277Case Docketed On:12/03/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:RUSSEL R. ROBINSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:RUSSEL R. ROBINSON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRussel R. RobinsonMegan Overmann Goetz
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Kristi Marie Radosevich
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 47
Citation:204 P.3d 987

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/03/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/03/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/10/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/10/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/18/2007Notice-Internal - Other letter re attorney feesNotice-InternalOtherFinal
03/07/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on cdBriefAppellantFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
04/21/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/01/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/13/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/16/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/02/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/20/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/20/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/22/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/21/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal