judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVIS (MATTHEW) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49451
Short Caption:DAVIS (MATTHEW) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47183 , 51723 , 58032 , 61128
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C202435Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/07/2007How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/15/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/15/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-10730
05/25/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 07-11587
08/07/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. 07-17274
08/07/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/03/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 07-21871
10/30/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-22199
10/30/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 1, 2007. 07-22199