Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kurth & Associates--check no. 8514. | | |
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. (Steel Engineers) Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 07-10656 |
05/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | | 07-10657 |
05/23/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. | | 07-11419 |
05/25/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 07-11566 |
05/31/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 07-11950 |
05/31/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | | 07-11952 |
06/07/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of docketing statement on settlement judge. | | 07-12466 |
06/18/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. because of scheduling difficulties, conference set for 7/6/07. | | 07-13307 |
07/05/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | | |
07/05/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (MGM Mirage). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 07-14667 |
07/05/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. (MGM Mirage) Due Date: 10 days | | 07-14668 |
07/05/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. (MGM Mirage) Due Date: 10 days | | 07-14669 |
07/05/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from MGM Mirage - check no. 47818. | | |
07/09/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement conference program. | | 07-14888 |
07/12/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing. Pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 07-15175 |
07/23/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant MGM Mirage. | | 07-16032 |
07/26/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Appellant MGM Mirage. Transcripts requested: 06/05/07. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. | | 07-16446 |
08/15/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to File Case Appeal Statement. Due: 10 days. Counsel cautioned. | | 07-17971 |
08/22/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 07-18633 |
10/11/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Appellant Steel Engineers. Brief due: November 13, 2007. | | 07-22491 |
10/11/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 13, 2007. | | 07-22525 |
10/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Consent to file Amicus Brief (signed by all parties involved in this appeal.) | | 07-23462 |
10/31/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Approving Consent to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Due: November 13, 2007. | | 07-23864 |
11/15/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 07-24921 |
11/29/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. and Re: Transcript. Opening Briefs due: 12/21/07. Ms. Hawkins in not required to file a copy of the transcript. | | 07-25744 |
12/19/2007 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae Carson City. | | 07-27521 |
12/21/2007 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Amicus Brief of Nevada State Insurance Commissioner. | | 07-27756 |
12/26/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant Steel Engineers. | | 07-27945 |
12/26/2007 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Appellant Steel Engineers. | | 07-27946 |
12/27/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant MGM Mirage's Opening Brief. | | 07-28142 |
12/27/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Appellant MGM Mirage's Opening Brief. | | 07-28143 |
01/09/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Appellant MGM Mirage's Opening Brief. | | 08-00588 |
01/22/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 22, 2008. | | 08-01601 |
02/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Nevada Insurance Guaranty Association's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief. | | 08-03380 |
02/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 48 pages. Answering Brief. | | 08-04592 |
02/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 08-04593 |
03/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant Property Casualty Insurers Association's unopposed motion to file an amicus brief and to do so subsequent to the filing of respondent's answering brief to the following extent. PCI's amicus brief due: 20 days. Each appellant's combined reply brief due: 50 days. | | 08-05491 |
03/18/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Emergency Motion for Second Extension of Time to file Amicus Curiae Brief. | | 08-06738 |
03/19/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. PCI: April 8, 2008 to file and serve amicus brief. Appellants: May 8, 2008 to file the reply briefs in response to the answering biref and PCI's amicus brief. | | 08-06816 |
03/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument. (Amicus Curiae Carson City, NV) | | 08-07331 |
04/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. As oral argument has not been scheduled in this appeal, we deny Carson City's motion for leave to participate in the oral argument of this appeal. | | 08-08050 |
04/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion of Amicus Curiae Legislature of the State of Nevada for Leave of this Court to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae beyond the Time Provided in N.R.A.P. 29. | | 08-08245 |
04/09/2008 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Amicus Brief of Property Casualty Insurers Association. | | 08-08831 |
04/14/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Supplemental Certificate of Service. (Motion of Amicus Curiae Legislature of the State of Nevada for Leave of this Court to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae beyond the Time Provided in N.R.A.P. 29.) | | 08-09264 |
04/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The Legislature shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file an amicus brief. Appellants shall each have 50 days from the date of this order to file a combined reply brief in response to the answering brief and the amicus briefs filed by PCI and the Legislature. | | 08-09566 |
05/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal. | | 08-10870 |
05/14/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Our April 17, 2008, order granting the Legislature's motion to file an amicus brief beyond the time provided in NRAP 29, is hereby vacated. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file combined reply briefs in response to the answering brief and Property Casualty Insurers Association's amicus brief. | | 08-12112 |
06/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time for Appellants to File Reply Briefs. | | 08-14984 |
06/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants: each shall have until July 11, 2008 to file a combined reply brief in response to respondent's answering brief and amicus brief filed by Property Casualty Insurers Association. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | | 08-15962 |
06/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Non-Opposition to Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 08-15980 |
07/14/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant's MGM Mirage and Steel Engineers. | | 08-18054 |
12/23/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on February 3, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. (En Banc) | | 08-32578 |
01/07/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to Participate in Oral Argument. | | 09-00312 |
01/15/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. This appeal is scheduled for 30 minutes of oral argument on February 3, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. Amicus curiae, the Consolidated Municipality of Carson City (Carson City), has filed a motion for leave to participate in oral argument. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The time for oral argument shall be expanded from 30 minutes to 60 minutes, and shall be allocated in the following manner: 25 minutes to appellants MGM Mirage and Steel Engineers, Inc., 5 minutes to amicus curiae Carson City, and 30 minutes to respondents Nevada Insurance Guaranty Association (NIGA). Carson City's oral argument shall be limited to arguments raised in its amicus brief. | | 09-01315 |
01/20/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 09-01516 |
01/20/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Governor. Judge Jerome M. Polaha to replace disqualified Justice Pickering. | | 09-01613 |
01/28/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed Executive Order. District Judge Jerome M. Polaha appointed to sit in the place of Justice Pickering. | | 09-02385 |
02/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
02/04/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authorities. | | 09-03046 |
02/04/2009 | Brief | Received Supplemental Authorities. Notice of Supplemental Legal Authorities. (FILED PER ORDER 02/17/09). | | 09-03049 |
02/17/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. We direct the clerk of the court to file the supplemental authorities provisionally received on February 4, 2009. | | 09-04022 |
02/17/2009 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. Notice of Supplemental Legal Authorities. | | 09-03049 |
06/25/2009 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, James W.. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Polaha. fn1-[The Honorable Jerome Polaha, Judge of the Second Judicial District Court, was designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, who voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 22. EN BANC. | | 09-15720 |
07/21/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 09-16874 |
07/21/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/30/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 27, 2009. | | 09-16874 |