Case: 05-23-01160-CV
05-23-01160-CV
11/17/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Jrmar "JJ" Jefferson and Lamar" Yaka" Jefferson
Eric Johnson and Adam Bazaldua
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/26/2024 | Record due | | |||||
12/08/2023 | Order entered | Consolidated/Voids |
| ||||
12/05/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
12/04/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
11/22/2023 | Motion to consolidate filed |
| |||||
11/22/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
11/21/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
11/20/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
11/20/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
11/20/2023 | Fee requested |
| |||||
11/17/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
10/17/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/28/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||
09/13/2023 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/08/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Johnson, Mayor Eric | Appellee | Richard B. Phillips Jr. Mia B. Lorick Jasmine M. Tobias |
Bazaldua, Adam | Appellee | Mark A. Melton |
Jefferson, Jrmar "JJ" | Appellant | Jrmar "JJ" Jefferson |
Jefferson, Lamar "Yaka" | Appellant | Lamar "Yaka" Jefferson |
Trial Court Information
101st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Staci Williams
DC-23-07425
Terri Etekochay