Case Information: 49431 | |||
Short Caption: | DOZIER (ESAU) VS. STATE C/W 49446 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 49431*, 49446 | Related Case(s): | 44972 , 50795 , 60781 , 63778 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR041978 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/22/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-10574 | |
05/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-11588 | |
08/22/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. TRANSFERRED TO CASE NO. 50795 PER ORDER OF 1/24/08. | 07-18629 | |
08/22/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/28/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS Nos. 49431/49446 | 07-28251 | |
01/22/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-01133 | |
01/22/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/29/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 25, 2008. | 08-01133 |