Case: 09-24-00019-CV
09-24-00019-CV
01/18/2024
Interlocutory
Erin White, Individually and as Shareholder of Blank Slate Salon Spa Boutique, LLC
Don Skipton
No
Ninth Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/08/2024 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
02/08/2024 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
01/26/2024 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
01/25/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/25/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/24/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/24/2024 | Letter filed |
| |||||
01/24/2024 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
01/24/2024 | Notice of late record |
| |||||
01/23/2024 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
01/18/2024 | Response filed |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Motion for emergency relief filed |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Fee paid | | |||||
01/18/2024 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | Accelerated |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/18/2024 | Status | Mandate to Issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
White, Erin | Appellant | Arturo Aguilar |
Skipton, Don | Appellee | Christopher Johnson |
Trial Court Information
457th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Vince Santini
23-11-16606-CV
Lorri Lucas