Case: 03-23-00772-CR
03-23-00772-CR
11/15/2023
Habeas Corpus
Ex parte Erik Neil Santee
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||
02/12/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||
02/08/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
02/08/2024 | Notice of late brief |
| |||
12/06/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
12/04/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
12/04/2023 | Notice of late record |
| |||
12/01/2023 | Email sent | | |||
11/15/2023 | Document filed | | |||
11/15/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/13/2024 | Status | State brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Santee, Erik Neil | Criminal - Appellant | Jeffrey Hindman Ms. Susan Schoon |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Stacey M. Soule Mr. Kelly Higgins |
Trial Court Information
453rd District Court
Hays
Honorable Sherri Tibbe
CR-21-0906-E
Lainey Fergueson