judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FERNANDEZ (KEVIN) VS. DIRECTOR, NEV. DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

Case Information: 49452
Short Caption:FERNANDEZ (KEVIN) VS. DIRECTOR, NEV. DEPT. OF CORRECTIONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - PI070535Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/31/2007How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/15/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/15/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-10733
05/25/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 07-11579
05/31/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 07-12010
05/31/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/23/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn5 [We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS. 08-01695
02/07/2008Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). 08-03110
03/04/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-04879
03/04/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/14/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 10, 2008. 08-04879