Case Information: 51372 | |||
Short Caption: | LEWIS VS. CABRERA-LAZO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45961 , 49505 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV0302180 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/03/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/03/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-08386 | |
04/24/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 08-10262 | |
05/09/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Fn5 [In light of this order we deny as moot appellant's request for transcripts. Additionally, appellant need not file the civil proper person appeal statement mailed to him on April 3, 2008.] SNP08-WM/RP/MD. | 08-11592 | |
06/03/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-12017 | |
06/03/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 9, 2008. | 08-12017 |