Case: 23-0544
23-0544
07/14/2023
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
DR. KIM ELLIOT MCMORRIES
TEXAS MEDICAL BOARD
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2024 | Reply to Response to Petition filed | Petitioner | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Kim Elliot McMorries. | |||||
02/07/2024 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the Texas Medical Board. | |||||
10/13/2023 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Kim Elliot McMorries. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2024 | Reply to Response to Petition filed | Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Kim Elliot McMorries. | ||||||
02/07/2024 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of the Texas Medical Board. | ||||||
12/20/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. Response is due February 7, 2024. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
12/20/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Texas Medical Board. | ||||||
12/08/2023 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than January 8, 2024. |
| |||||
11/07/2023 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
11/02/2023 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Texas Medical Board. | ||||||
10/13/2023 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Kim Elliot McMorries. |
| |||||
09/12/2023 | Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due October 13, 2023. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. |
| ||||
09/12/2023 | Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Kim Elliot McMorries. |
| |||||
08/29/2023 | Designation of Lead Counsel | Designation of Lead Counsel filed on behalf of the Texas Medical Board. | ||||||
08/14/2023 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due September 13, 2023. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. |
| ||||
08/14/2023 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Kim Elliot McMorries. |
| |||||
07/14/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review granted. Petition for Review is due no later than August 14, 2023. |
| ||||
07/14/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Dr. Kim Elliot McMorries. |
| |||||
07/14/2023 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
07/14/2023 | Clerk's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/07/2023 | Work-Up by Staff / Review by Justices | Under Review |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Medical Board | Respondent | Mr. Ted A. Ross Ms. Kara D. Holsinger |
McMorries, M.D., Kim Elliot | Petitioner | Mr. Kurt Kuhn Mr. W. Wade Flasowski IV Ms. Lisa Hobbs Mr. C. Victor Haley |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-21-00141-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 05-30-23
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable Darlene Byrne
Trial Court Information
459th District Court
Travis
Honorable Maya Guerra Gamble
D-1-GN-20-006852