Case: 14-23-00487-CR
14-23-00487-CR
07/14/2023
Miscellaneous/Other Criminal including Misdemeanor or Felony
Regan Anthony Ellison
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
02/07/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | State brief due | | |||||
03/07/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
03/07/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
02/13/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/07/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/27/2023 | Response due | | |||||
11/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
11/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/16/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
11/15/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
10/16/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
10/16/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
09/15/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||
09/15/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | GRANTED |
| ||||
09/15/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
09/15/2023 | Record due | | |||||
09/05/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
08/22/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
07/14/2023 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||||
07/14/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
07/06/2023 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
06/13/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
06/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
05/18/2023 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ellison, Regan Anthony | Criminal - Appellant | Crespin Michael Linton |
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Tom Selleck |
Trial Court Information
239th District Court
Brazoria
94430-CR
Ida H. Salinas
2 years TDCJ