judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEIROVITCH VS. HALES

Case Information: 49456
Short Caption:MEIROVITCH VS. HALESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 05CV0092Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2007 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/15/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Downey Brand-check no. 0386.
05/15/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-10818
05/24/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-11489
05/24/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/26/07. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hewerdine. 07-11490
05/31/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/26/07. Court Reporter: Carrie Hewerdine. 07-11999
06/06/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. 07-12303
06/22/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-13733
08/31/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-19320
09/19/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 07-20633
09/28/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 07-21500
10/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP-TH 07-22102
10/08/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.