judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITE VS. PARK LIVESTOCK CO.

Case Information: 49455
Short Caption:WHITE VS. PARK LIVESTOCK CO.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 06CV70Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2007 / Olsen, PhilipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/15/2007OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons. Sitting District Judge was Michael Gibbons.
05/15/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Day R. Williams - check no. 4851.
05/15/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-10816
05/30/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-11897
06/01/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 07-12059
06/06/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip A. Olsen. 07-12349
06/15/2007MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 07-13164
06/25/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 07-13795
07/03/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. returning, unfiled, Reply in Support of Mlotion to Dismiss Appeal (per RNAP 27(a). 07-14503
07/06/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. because respondent is not inclined to engage in meaningful discussions until the pending motion to dismiss is decided. 07-14798
07/16/2007MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 07-15399
08/23/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Entry of Orders (2 district court orders.) 07-18671
09/04/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. 07-19407
09/13/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to dismiss appeal. We deny as moot respondent's motion for leave to file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss. 07-20259
11/16/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 07-25014
11/16/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 07-25015
11/28/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). 07-25622
11/28/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.