judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARBER VS. GIBSON

Case Information: 51369
Short Caption:BARBER VS. GIBSONCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 50327 , 50530
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D332039Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/07/2008 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/03/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robin J. Barber--USPS M.O. No. 11118593520.
04/03/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-08342
04/07/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. 08-08570
04/18/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-09729
05/05/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/21/08. 08-11090
05/29/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 08-13526
05/29/2008MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 08-13527
06/24/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK-TH [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-16162
06/24/2008Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.