Case Information: 49434 | |||
Short Caption: | VOLPICELLI (FERRILL) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42881 , 44556 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982160 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 07-10591 | |
05/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice James Hardesty sat in district court proceedings. | 07-10592 | |
06/13/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-12956 | |
06/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. - Joint Appendix. | 07-12957 | |
06/13/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix. | 07-12958 | |
06/15/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Fast Track Statement and Appendix. | 07-13119 | |
06/27/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-14061 | |
10/12/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn3 [Because Volpicelli is represented by counsel in this matter, we decline to grant him permission to file documents in proper person in this court. Accordingly, this court shall take no action and shall not consider the proper person documents Volpicelli has submitted to this court in this matter.] NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-22688 | |
11/06/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22714 | |
11/06/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/16/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 8, 2007. | 07-22714 |