Case Information: 49432 | |||
Short Caption: | WINSLETT (KENNETH) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 42429 , 51591 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030617 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/28/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-10576 | |
05/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-11586 | |
08/28/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-19053 | |
08/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/01/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn6[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] NNP08G-MG/MC/NS | 07-24037 | |
11/28/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-25156 | |
11/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/06/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 2007. | 07-25156 |