Case Information: 51366 | |||
Short Caption: | CINA (ERIC) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55363 , 59998 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C221236 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/03/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/02/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/02/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-08248 | |
04/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 08-08252 | |
04/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Karen A. Connolly and Holly E. Roys of Karen A. Connolly, Ltd. | 08-10146 | |
04/29/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 08-10681 | |
05/13/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. It appears that Mr. Lucherini no longer represents appellant in this appeal, the clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Lucherini as counsel of record for appellant. Ms. Connolly and Ms. Roys: 15 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement and a transcript request form. | 08-11937 | |
05/27/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-13259 | |
05/27/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/22/08 through 1/25/08. To Court Reporter: Michelle Ramsey. | 08-13260 | |
06/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter-Michelle Ramsey. | 08-15886 | |
07/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Ms. Ramsey shall have until July 16, 2008, to prepare the transcripts, file copies in the district court and deliver copies to appellant. Ms. Ramsey shall have until July 28, 2008, to file, in this court a certificate acknowledging delivery of the transcripts. | 08-16993 | |
07/11/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/22/08 through 1/25/08. | 08-17817 | |
08/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. 120 days. | 08-20087 | |
08/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant appellant's motion to the following extent. Appellant: opening brief and appendix due: 9/29/08 | 08-21774 | |
10/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-25525 | |
10/14/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: October 20, 2008. | 08-26402 | |
10/16/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michelle Ramsey stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/20/08. | 08-26743 | |
10/16/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Request for Expedited Transcripts of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/20/08. To Court Reporter: Michelle Ramsey. | 08-26748 | |
10/22/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-27148 | |
10/22/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols 1-4. | 08-27152 | |
11/26/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-30233 | |
12/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 20, 2009 | 08-32724 | |
01/23/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-02008 | |
03/03/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-05309 | |
03/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-13861 | |
06/30/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-15154 | |
06/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 1, 2009. | 09-15154 |