judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OZAWA VS. VISION AIRLINES C/W 49660

Case Information: 49435
Short Caption:OZAWA VS. VISION AIRLINES C/W 49660Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:49435*, 49660 Related Case(s): 49660
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A518710Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:05/23/2007 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/03/2009How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/14/2007Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kemp & Kemp--check no. 2983.
05/14/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 07-10594
05/23/2007Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. 07-11415
06/04/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-12143
06/04/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. 07-12144
06/14/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 07-13017
06/25/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 07-13808
07/30/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-16678
08/02/2007MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Appellant's, Respondent's and Cross-Appellant's Motion to Consolidate pursuant to NRAP Rule 27(b). Nos. 49435/49660-cases are not consolidated. 07-17005
08/13/2007MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response of Vision Airlines f/k/a Aviation Ventures, Inc., a Nevada Corporation, to Leland Ozawa's Motion to Consolidate pursuant to NRAP Rule 27(b). Nos. 49435/49660-cases are not consolidated. 07-17853
09/24/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Kemp & Kemp 07-21028
10/01/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Eric Zubel) Nos. 49435/49660-cases are not consolidated. 07-21612
12/07/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Appeals, Regarding Conclussion of Settlement Proceeding in Docket No. 49435, Dismissing Appeal in Part in Docket No. 49660, and Settling Briefing Schedule. The settlement judge has filed a report with this court indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement in Docket No. 49435. Settlement proceedings are complete in Docket No. 49435. Appellant Leland Ozawa has filed motions requesting that this court consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Cause appearing, we grant the motions. These appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. We dismiss Ozawa's appeal in Docket No. 49660 in part. The appeal and cross-appeal in Docket No. 49660 may proceed as to the post-judgment order denying in part and granting in part Vision's motion for attorney fees and costs. Ozawa and Vision: 15 days to request transcripts. Ozawa: 90 days to file the opening brief and appendix on appeal. Vision shall have 30 days from service of Ozawa's opening brief to file a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Ozawa shall have 30 days from service of Vision's combined brief to file a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Finally, Vision shall have 30 days from service of Ozawa's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. 07-26610
12/20/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Vision Airlines. Transcripts requested: 05/09/07. To Court Reporter: Jackie Nelson. Nos. 49435/49660. 07-27590
12/26/2007Other Other. Filed Notice of Transcript Submission. Nos. 49435/49660 07-27921
01/22/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We waive the requirement for Ozawa to file a procedurally compliant transcript request form in this instance only. The clerk shall detach the February 28, 2007, transcript from the notice and file it separtately herein. Court Reporter Lee Bahr has no obligation regarding the February 28, 2007, transcript. Nos. 49435/49660. 08-01566
01/22/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 02/28/07. Court Reporter: Lee Bahr. Nos. 49435/49660. 08-01567
01/25/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jackie Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/09/07. Nos. 49435/49660. 08-01954
03/07/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent (in 49660). Nos. 49435/49660. (08-05794). 08-05794
03/07/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent (in 49660). Nos. 49435/49660. (08-05796). 08-05796
04/04/2008MotionFiled Stipulation. For Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and to File Reply Brief. Nos. 49435/49660 08-08505
04/17/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Approving Stipulation. Respondents/cross-appellant's answering brief/opening brief due: 05/07/08. Appellant/cross-respondent Leland Ozawa' reply brief/answering brief due: 07/07/08. Respondents/cross-appellant's reply brief due 30 days if deemed necessary. Nos. 49435/49660. 08-09570
05/07/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Emergency Motion for Second Extension to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 49435/49660 (08-11387). 08-11387
05/14/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering/Opening Brief due: 7 days. Appellant/cross-respondent Leland Ozawa' reply brief/answering brief due: 07/07/08. Respondents/cross-appellant's reply brief due 30 days from the date of appellant's service if deemed necessary. Nos. 49435/49660. 08-12104
05/15/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Nos. 49435/49660. 08-12268
05/15/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Nos. 49435/49660. 08-12272
07/10/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Appellant's Reply Brief and Answering Brief. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent Ozawa). Nos. 49435/49660 (08-17616). 08-17616
08/12/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Respondents/Cross-Appellant Nos. 49435/49660 08-20806
01/12/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Representing Respondent/Cross-Appellants as co-counsel, Harold P. Gewerter Esq. in the place and stead of Eric Zubel, Esq.. Nos. 49435/49660. 09-00838
02/03/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. Nos. 49435/49660. 09-02983
02/03/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/01/2009Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before Parraguirre/Douglas/Pickering. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Parraguirre/Douglas/Pickering. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43SNP09/Parraguirre/Douglas/Pickering. Nos. 49435/49660 09-23888
10/20/2009Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Petition for Rehearing. Via E-Flex. Nos. 49535/49660.
10/20/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion to Exceed Page Limits Under NRAP 40 (b)(3). Nos. 49435/49660. 09-25538
10/20/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Supplemental Certificate of Service - Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and the Appellant's Motion to Exceed Page Limits. Nos. 49435/49660. 09-25574
10/23/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. We direct the clerk of this court to file the 13-page petition for rehearing provisionally received on October 20, 2009. Nos. 49435/49660. 09-26034
10/23/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 49435/49660. 09-26035
10/23/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. E-Payment $150 from James P. Kemp. Nos. 49435/49660.
11/12/2009Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 49435/49660. 09-27613
11/24/2009Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 49435/49660. 09-28655
01/22/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Answer due: 15 days. Nos. 49435/49660. 10-01903
02/05/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answer to Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 49435/49660. 10-03427
03/17/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC Nos. 49435/49660. 10-07021
03/22/2010MotionFiled Motion. Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Bill of Costs. Nos. 49660/49435 (10-07528).
04/12/2010RemittiturIssued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $104.00. 10-09474
04/12/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $104.00. 10-07755
04/12/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/22/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 15, 2010. 10-07755